TX HB768 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Reported favorably as substituted
Pending: House County Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Reported favorably as substituted
Pending: House County Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the requirement that certain governmental bodies make audio and video recordings of open meetings available on the Internet.
Title
Relating to the requirement that certain governmental bodies make audio and video recordings of open meetings available on the Internet.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2020-12-08 | House | Filed |