TX HB768 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the reappraisal for ad valorem tax purposes of property damaged in a disaster.
Title
Relating to the reappraisal for ad valorem tax purposes of property damaged in a disaster.
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB202 (Same As) 2019-02-01 - Referred to Property Tax
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB768 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00768I.htm |