TX HB722 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Record vote RV#541
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the development of brackish groundwater.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the development of brackish groundwater.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - House - Passed RV#541 (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseRecord vote RV#541
2019-04-18HousePassed
2019-04-18HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-17HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-17HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-02HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-02HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Natural Resources
2019-02-21HouseRead first time
2019-01-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback