TX HB717 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the duties of and the application of the professional prosecutors law to the county attorney in Lavaca County and to the duties of the district attorney for the 25th Judicial District.
Title
Relating to the duties of and the application of the professional prosecutors law to the county attorney in Lavaca County and to the duties of the district attorney for the 25th Judicial District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-01 - House - HB 717Third Reading House (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-23 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Jurisprudence |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-01 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-01 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-01 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-01 | House | Passed |
2013-05-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-30 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-04-24 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-08 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2013-04-08 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-04-04 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-03-25 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-18 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2013-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-25 | House | Filed |