TX HB669 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the use of the universal service fund for the provision of broadband service in underserved rural areas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the use of the universal service fund for the provision of broadband service in underserved rural areas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - House - Read 3rd time RV#847 (Y: 114 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-05-03SenateRead first time
2019-05-01SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-01HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-01HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-01HouseRecord vote RV#847
2019-05-01HousePassed
2019-05-01HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-30HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-30HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-30HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-29HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-10HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-21HouseReferred to State Affairs
2019-02-21HouseRead first time
2019-01-07HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback