TX HB661 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to voting system equipment used by counties participating in the countywide polling place program.
Title
Relating to voting system equipment used by counties participating in the countywide polling place program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Elections |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-24 | House | Filed |