TX HB645 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the appointment of certain trustees of the Blinn Junior College District.
Title
Relating to the appointment of certain trustees of the Blinn Junior College District.
Sponsors
Rep. John Raney [R] | Sen. Phil King [R] | Rep. Briscoe Cain [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BLINN JUNIOR COLLEGE DISTRICT
County Government
County Government--General
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Junior College Districts
Education--Nonpublic Schools
Education--Nonpublic Schools--Vocational/Avocational
County Government
County Government--General
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Junior College Districts
Education--Nonpublic Schools
Education--Nonpublic Schools--Vocational/Avocational