TX HB593 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Referred to International Relations & Economic Development
Pending: House International Relations & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Referred to International Relations & Economic Development
Pending: House International Relations & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to establishing an intergovernmental development corporation in certain counties to foster minority- or women-owned construction businesses.
Title
Relating to establishing an intergovernmental development corporation in certain counties to foster minority- or women-owned construction businesses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB340 (Same As) 2021-03-09 - Referred to Business & Commerce
HB1986 (Same As) 2021-03-15 - Referred to International Relations & Economic Development
HB1986 (Same As) 2021-03-15 - Referred to International Relations & Economic Development
Subjects
BUILDING CONSTRUCTION
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--Small Business & Minority Business
County Government
County Government--General
DEVELOPMENT CORPORATIONS
Intergovernmental Relations
Political Subdivisions
Women
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--Small Business & Minority Business
County Government
County Government--General
DEVELOPMENT CORPORATIONS
Intergovernmental Relations
Political Subdivisions
Women
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB593 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00593I.htm |