TX HB584 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Referred to Elections
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to automatic voter registration on issuance or change of a driver's license or identification card by the Department of Public Safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to automatic voter registration on issuance or change of a driver's license or identification card by the Department of Public Safety.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Elections
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2020-11-17HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB98 (Same As) 2021-03-30 - Co-author authorized
HB111 (Same As) 2021-02-25 - Referred to Elections
HB124 (Same As) 2021-02-25 - Referred to Elections

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback