TX SB98 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to automatic voter registration on issuance or change of a driver's license or identification card by the Department of Public Safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to automatic voter registration on issuance or change of a driver's license or identification card by the Department of Public Safety.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-03SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2020-11-09SenateFiled
2020-11-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB111 (Same As) 2021-02-25 - Referred to Elections
HB124 (Same As) 2021-02-25 - Referred to Elections
HB584 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Referred to Elections

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback