US SB3543 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-18 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-18 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to establish the Historic Greenwood District-Black Wall Street National Monument in the State of Oklahoma, and for other purposes.
Title
Historic Greenwood District—Black Wall Street National Monument Establishment Act
Sponsors
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
Sen. John Hickenlooper [D-CO] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-18 | House | Held at the desk. |
2024-12-18 | House | Received in the House. |
2024-12-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2024-12-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7079; text: CR S7079) |
2024-11-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 602. |
2024-11-21 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Manchin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2024-11-19 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2023-12-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB9259 (Same As) 2024-08-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.