TX HB505 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the sale of fireworks on and before the Labor Day holiday in certain counties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the sale of fireworks on and before the Labor Day holiday in certain counties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#582 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06SenateReferred to Local Government
2021-05-06SenateRead first time
2021-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-30HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-30HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-30HouseRecord vote RV#582
2021-04-30HousePassed
2021-04-30HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-30HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-30HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-30HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-30HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-20HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-13HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-13HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-13HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-13HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to County Affairs
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2020-11-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback