TX HB5 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-29)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-08 - Reported favorably as substituted
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-08 - Reported favorably as substituted
Summary
Relating to the elimination of smoking in all workplaces and public places; providing penalties.
Title
Relating to the elimination of smoking in all workplaces and public places; providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-08 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-08 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-08 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-28 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-28 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-12 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-02-12 | Read first time | |
2009-01-07 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB544 (Same As) 2009-05-21 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Health
Health--General
SMOKING
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Business & Commerce--General
Health
Health--General
SMOKING
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF