TX HB4712 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the powers and duties of the Fort Bend County Levee Improvement District No. 7.
Title
Relating to the powers and duties of the Fort Bend County Levee Improvement District No. 7.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1863 (Y: 107 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#962 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#962 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction HCR 187 |
2019-05-25 | House | House adopts resolution for tech. correction HCR 187 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#1863 |
2019-05-24 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Creighton |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Water & Rural Affairs |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-10 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-03 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#962 |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-03 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-23 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-17 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2019-04-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-05 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BRAZOS RIVER
FORT BEND COUNTY LEVEE IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NO. 7
Purchasing
Purchasing--General
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
WATER
Water--Rights
FORT BEND COUNTY LEVEE IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NO. 7
Purchasing
Purchasing--General
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
WATER
Water--Rights