TX HB4674 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-27 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-27 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to the regulation of driver's licenses and personal identification certificates by the Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas, including enforcement measures against fictitious or fraudulently obtained licenses or certificates; providing a criminal penalty.
Title
Relating to the regulation of driver's licenses and personal identification certificates by the Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas, including enforcement measures against fictitious or fraudulently obtained licenses or certificates; providing a criminal penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-27 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-27 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-27 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-27 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Public Safety | |
2009-03-26 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1785 (Same As) 2009-05-27 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Subjects
FRAUD
GANGS
IDENTIFICATION CARDS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
GANGS
IDENTIFICATION CARDS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses