TX HB4653 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Postponed 6/19/21 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of the Lancaster Logistics District; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of the Lancaster Logistics District; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13HousePostponed 6/19/21 10:00 AM
2021-05-13HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-12HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-07HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-04HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-26HouseReferred to Urban Affairs
2021-04-26HouseRead first time
2021-04-22HouseTransmitted to the Governor
2021-04-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2210 (Same As) 2021-05-10 - No action taken in committee
SB2210 (Same As) 2021-05-10 - No action taken in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback