TX SB2210 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - No action taken in committee
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of the Lancaster Logistics District; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of the Lancaster Logistics District; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10SenateNo action taken in committee
2021-05-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-19SenateReferred to Local Government
2021-04-19SenateRead first time
2021-04-15SenateTransmitted to the Governor
2021-04-14SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB4653 (Same As) 2021-05-13 - Postponed 6/19/21 10:00 AM
HB4653 (Same As) 2021-05-13 - Postponed 6/19/21 10:00 AM

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback