TX HB4472 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the Texas emissions reduction plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Texas emissions reduction plan.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1638 (Y: 103 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1098 (Y: 117 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-18 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-28HouseRecord vote RV#1638
2021-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-25SenateRecord vote
2021-05-25SenatePassed
2021-05-25SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-25SenateRecord vote
2021-05-25SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-25SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-24SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-24SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-24SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-20SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-20SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-17SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2021-05-17SenateRead first time
2021-05-17SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-14HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-14HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1098
2021-05-14HousePassed
2021-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-13HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-13HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-13HouseAmended 4-Howard
2021-05-13HouseAmended 3-Canales
2021-05-13HouseAmendment adopted as amended 1-Landgraf
2021-05-13HouseAmendment amended 2-C. Bell
2021-05-13HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Landgraf
2021-05-13HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-11HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-29HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-29HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-29HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-29HouseReferred to Environmental Regulation
2021-03-29HouseRead first time
2021-03-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB4472
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB04472I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB04472H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB04472E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB04472S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB04472F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB04472H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB04472H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB04472H23.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB04472H24.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB04472I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB04472H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB04472H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB04472E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB04472E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB04472S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB04472S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB04472F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB4472&RcdVtNo=1098&Ch=H&Dt=05/14/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-25-F.PDF#page=96
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-25-F.PDF#page=97
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB4472&RcdVtNo=1638&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2021

Bill Comments

feedback