TX HB4426 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of certain counties to cancel platted subdivisions that have remained undeveloped.
Title
Relating to the authority of certain counties to cancel platted subdivisions that have remained undeveloped.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#903 (Y: 134 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-08 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#903 |
2021-05-08 | House | Passed |
2021-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-07 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-07 | House | Amended 1-T. King |
2021-05-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-28 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-28 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1878 (Same As) 2021-03-26 - Referred to Local Government
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
County Government
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
PLATTING
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
County Government
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
PLATTING