TX HB439 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a limitation on civil suits against persons reporting suspicious activity in good faith.
Title
Relating to a limitation on civil suits against persons reporting suspicious activity in good faith.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-02-20 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-30 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB439 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00439I.htm |