TX HB4272 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-29 - Senate appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-29 - Senate appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requirements for and prohibited uses of information contained in the immunization registry.
Title
Relating to requirements for and prohibited uses of information contained in the immunization registry.
Sponsors
Rep. Stephanie Klick [R] | Rep. Tom Oliverson [R] | Rep. Donna Howard [D] | Rep. Jacey Jetton [R] |
Rep. Robert Guerra [D] | Rep. Stephen Allison [R] | Rep. Erin Zwiener [D] | Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#849 (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#849 (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-29 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-29 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | House appoints conferees |
2021-05-28 | House | House requests conference committee |
2021-05-28 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2021-05-28 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 11, Section 2 |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Amended |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Kolkhorst |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Amended |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Kolkhorst |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-07 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-07 | House | Record vote RV#849 |
2021-05-07 | House | Passed |
2021-05-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-06 | House | Amended 1-Klick |
2021-05-06 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2021-05-05 | House | Postponed 5/6/21 10:00 AM |
2021-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-05 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COVID-19
Electronic Information Systems
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Health--General
IMMUNIZATIONS
INFORMED CONSENT
INTERNET
Labor
Labor--General
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Electronic Information Systems
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Health--General
IMMUNIZATIONS
INFORMED CONSENT
INTERNET
Labor
Labor--General
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF