TX HB396 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Reported engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to acceptable uses of the instructional materials and technology fund and the instructional materials and technology allotment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to acceptable uses of the instructional materials and technology fund and the instructional materials and technology allotment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#73 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseReported engrossed
2019-03-21HouseRecord vote RV#73
2019-03-21HousePassed
2019-03-21HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-20HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-03-20HouseAmended 1-Ashby
2019-03-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-06HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-06HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-02-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-02-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-02-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Public Education
2019-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-11-19HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback