TX HB3889 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-04 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-04 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the handling of bids on certain construction contracts for highway projects and buildings.
Title
Relating to the handling of bids on certain construction contracts for highway projects and buildings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2023-05-04 | House | Companion considered in lieu of CSSB 1021 |
2023-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2023-03-20 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1021 (Same As) 2023-05-24 - Effective immediately
SB1021 (Same As) 2023-05-24 - Effective immediately
SB1021 (Same As) 2023-05-24 - Effective immediately
Subjects
COMPETITIVE BIDDING
Highways
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION, TEXAS
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Highways
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION, TEXAS
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Miscellaneous