TX SB1021 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the handling of bids on certain contracts for highway projects.
Title
Relating to the handling of bids on certain contracts for highway projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1145 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1145 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Effective immediately | |
2023-05-24 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-12 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-11 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Read |
2023-05-11 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2023-05-08 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2023-05-05 | House | Record vote RV#1145 |
2023-05-05 | House | Passed |
2023-05-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-04 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-04 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 3889 |
2023-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-26 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-04 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2023-04-04 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-03 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Filed |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3889 (Same As) 2023-05-04 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB3889 (Same As) 2023-05-04 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB3889 (Same As) 2023-05-04 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
BUILDING CONSTRUCTION
COMPETITIVE BIDDING
Highways
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION, TEXAS
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Miscellaneous
COMPETITIVE BIDDING
Highways
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION, TEXAS
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Miscellaneous