TX HB3831 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain technical violations of conditions of community supervision.
Title
Relating to certain technical violations of conditions of community supervision.
Sponsors
Rep. Carl Sherman [D] | Rep. Jarvis Johnson [D] | Rep. Leo Pacheco [D] | Rep. James White [R] |
Rep. Phil Stephenson [R] | Rep. Alma Allen [D] | Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D] | Rep. Toni Rose [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2019-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION