TX HB3812 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the release of student directory information by a public institution of higher education.
Title
Relating to the release of student directory information by a public institution of higher education.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Hunter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-23 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2021-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Protection of Personal Information
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Protection of Personal Information