TX HB3668 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to grants for disaster response by nonprofit food banks.
Title
Relating to grants for disaster response by nonprofit food banks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1906 (Y: 116 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#989 (Y: 118 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Read 2nd time RV#949 (Y: 99 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#989 (Y: 118 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Read 2nd time RV#949 (Y: 99 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#1906 |
2019-05-24 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Water & Rural Affairs |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#989 |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#949 |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-30 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2019-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2334 (Same As) 2019-05-09 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Subjects
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
FOOD
GIFTS & DONATIONS
Governor
Human Services
Human Services--Food Programs
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
FOOD
GIFTS & DONATIONS
Governor
Human Services
Human Services--Food Programs
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control