TX HB3660 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-15 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-15 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to creating a recognition day in honor of Vietnam veterans.
Title
Relating to creating a recognition day in honor of Vietnam veterans.
Sponsors
Rep. Leo Berman [R] | Rep. Norma Chavez [D] | Rep. Frank Corte [R] | Rep. Joe Farias [D] |
Rep. Wayne Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-15 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-15 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-19 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | |
2009-03-19 | Read first time | |
2009-03-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1903 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately