TX HB3602 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to domestic corporations and other domestic entities.
Title
Relating to domestic corporations and other domestic entities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2019-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1971 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19