TX HB3575 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-18 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-18 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to eligibility for supplemental financial assistance provided to certain grandparents.
Title
Relating to eligibility for supplemental financial assistance provided to certain grandparents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-15 - House - HB 3575Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-17 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-15 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-15 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-15 | House | Passed |
2015-05-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-15 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-15 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-05-15 | House | Amended |
2015-05-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-15 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-05-13 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-05-11 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-05-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-06 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-05-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-05-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2015-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-12 | House | Filed |