TX HB3541 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-05 - Laid on the table subject to call
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-05 - Laid on the table subject to call
Summary
Relating to the colonia self-help program.
Title
Relating to the colonia self-help program.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | Laid on the table subject to call | |
2009-05-05 | Companion considered in lieu of | |
2009-05-04 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-02 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-21 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-09 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-07 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-19 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-03-19 | Read first time | |
2009-03-11 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1371 (Same As) 2009-05-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Subjects
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
COLONIAS
Housing
Housing--Finance
Political Subdivisions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
WATER
Water--Development
Water--General
COLONIAS
Housing
Housing--Finance
Political Subdivisions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
WATER
Water--Development
Water--General