TX HB3409 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the provision of services and resources to certain individuals by a state supported living center and to the creation of a schedule of support services a state supported living center may provide and procedures for establishing applicable fees for those services.
Title
Relating to the provision of services and resources to certain individuals by a state supported living center and to the creation of a schedule of support services a state supported living center may provide and procedures for establishing applicable fees for those services.
Sponsors
Rep. Stan Lambert [R] | Rep. Phil Stephenson [R] | Rep. Richard Raymond [D] | Rep. Lynn Stucky [R] |
Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2017-03-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Mental Health & Substance Abuse