TX HB3317 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 26 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation and re-creation of funds and accounts, the dedication and rededication of revenue and allocation of accrued interest on dedicated revenue, and the exemption of unappropriated money from use for general governmental purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation and re-creation of funds and accounts, the dedication and rededication of revenue and allocation of accrued interest on dedicated revenue, and the exemption of unappropriated money from use for general governmental purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1917 (Y: 131 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#523 (Y: 120 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-26HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1917
2019-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-22HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateAmended
2019-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Nelson
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-22SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Finance
2019-04-24SenateRead first time
2019-04-23SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-18HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-18HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-18HouseRecord vote RV#523
2019-04-18HousePassed
2019-04-18HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-17HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-17HouseAmended 3-Oliverson
2019-04-17HouseAmended 2-J. González
2019-04-17HouseAmended 1-Walle
2019-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-17HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-10HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-18HouseReferred to Appropriations
2019-03-18HouseRead first time
2019-03-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2179 (Same As) 2019-04-24 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback