TX SB2179 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation and re-creation of funds and accounts, the dedication and rededication of revenue and allocation of accrued interest on dedicated revenue, and the exemption of unappropriated money from use for general governmental purposes.
Title
Relating to the creation and re-creation of funds and accounts, the dedication and rededication of revenue and allocation of accrued interest on dedicated revenue, and the exemption of unappropriated money from use for general governmental purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Jane Nelson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3317 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - See remarks for effective date
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Budget
State Finances--Management & Control
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Budget
State Finances--Management & Control
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB2179 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB02179I.htm |