TX HB3262 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to causes of action for withholding payments of the proceeds from the sale of oil and gas production.
Title
Relating to causes of action for withholding payments of the proceeds from the sale of oil and gas production.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2021-05-06 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 1259 |
2021-04-27 | House | Postponed 5/6/21 10:00 AM |
2021-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-27 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-31 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-31 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2021-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1259 (Same As) 2021-05-24 - Effective immediately