TX SB1259 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to causes of action for withholding payments of the proceeds from the sale of oil and gas production.
Title
Relating to causes of action for withholding payments of the proceeds from the sale of oil and gas production.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#888 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Effective immediately | |
2021-05-24 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-12 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-10 | Senate | House passage reported |
2021-05-07 | House | Record vote RV#888 |
2021-05-07 | House | Passed |
2021-05-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-06 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 3262 |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-05 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-30 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2021-04-30 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-28 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Amended |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Birdwell |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3262 (Same As) 2021-05-06 - Laid on the table subject to call