TX HB32 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on August 4 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-08-14 - Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the administration of the ad valorem tax system; authorizing fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the administration of the ad valorem tax system; authorizing fees.

Sponsors

Rep. Dennis Bonnen [R]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Richard Raymond [D]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]
Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Alma Allen [D]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Diana Arevalo [D]
Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Diego Bernal [D]Rep. Cesar Blanco [D]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]
Rep. Cindy Burkett [R]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Angie Button [R]
Rep. Terry Canales [D]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. Nicole Collier [D]
Rep. Byron Cook [R]Rep. Scott Cosper [R]Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Yvonne Davis [D]
Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]Rep. Wayne Faircloth [R]Rep. Pat Fallon [R]
Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Charlie Geren [R]Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]
Rep. Helen Giddings [D]Rep. Lance Gooden [R]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]
Rep. Abel Herrero [D]Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D]Rep. Donna Howard [D]Rep. Celia Israel [D]
Rep. Jarvis Johnson [D]Rep. Tracy King [D]Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]
Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Lyle Larson [R]Rep. Oscar Longoria [D]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]
Rep. Armando Martinez [D]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]Rep. Rick Miller [R]
Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]Rep. Joseph Moody [D]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]Rep. Sergio Munoz [D]
Rep. Victoria Neave [D]Rep. Poncho Nevarez [D]Rep. Rene Oliveira [D]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]
Rep. Lina Ortega [D]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Mary Perez [D]
Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. Joe Pickett [D]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. John Raney [R]
Rep. Kevin Roberts [R]Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D]Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D]Rep. Toni Rose [D]
Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Mike Schofield [R]Rep. Leighton Schubert [R]Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]
Rep. Ron Simmons [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Shawn Thierry [D]
Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Chris Turner [D]Rep. Tomas Uresti [D]Rep. Armando Walle [D]
Rep. James White [R]Rep. Terry Wilson [R]Rep. Paul Workman [R]Rep. Eugene Wu [D]
Rep. William Zedler [R]Rep. John Zerwas [R]Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R]

Roll Calls

2017-08-03 - House - Amended RV#46 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-14SenatePostponed
2017-08-11SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-08-11SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-08-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-08-07SenateReferred to Government Reform, Select
2017-08-07SenateRead first time
2017-08-04SenateReceived from the House
2017-08-04HouseReported engrossed
2017-08-03HouseRecord vote
2017-08-03HousePassed as amended
2017-08-03HouseAmended
2017-08-03HouseAmended
2017-08-03HouseRead 3rd time
2017-08-02HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-08-02HouseAmended
2017-08-02HouseAmendment withdrawn
2017-08-02HouseAmended
2017-08-02HouseAmended
2017-08-02HouseAmendment withdrawn
2017-08-02HouseVote reconsidered
2017-08-02HouseAmended
2017-08-02HouseAmendment withdrawn
2017-08-02HouseAmended
2017-08-02HouseRead 2nd time
2017-08-02HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-08-01HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-07-31HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-07-31HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-07-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-07-28HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-07-28HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-07-28HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2017-07-27HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2017-07-27HouseRead first time
2017-07-26HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback