TX HB3184 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-20 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-20 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment, operation, and funding of victim-offender mediation programs; authorizing fees.
Title
Relating to the establishment, operation, and funding of victim-offender mediation programs; authorizing fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-29 - House - HB 3184Third Reading House (Y: 99 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - HB 3184Third Reading House (Y: 87 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - HB 3184Third Reading House (Y: 87 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-20 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-06-01 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-06-01 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction |
2015-05-31 | House | House adopts resolution for tech. correction |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-29 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2015-05-29 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-29 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-29 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-12 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-12 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-12 | House | Passed |
2015-05-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-11 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-11 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-05-11 | House | Amended |
2015-05-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-22 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2015-03-24 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CRIME VICTIMS
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Pretrial Procedure
Family
Family--Juvenile Delinquency
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Pretrial Procedure
Family
Family--Juvenile Delinquency
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION