TX HB309 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-15 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-15 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the criminal offense of indecent assault, to judicial protection for victims of that offense, and to certain criminal acts committed in relation to that offense.
Title
Relating to the creation of the criminal offense of indecent assault, to judicial protection for victims of that offense, and to certain criminal acts committed in relation to that offense.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Rep. Morgan Meyer [R] | Rep. Nicole Collier [D] | Rep. Jeff Leach [R] |
Rep. Michelle Beckley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB194 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - See remarks for effective date
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
CRIME VICTIMS
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
SEXUAL ASSAULT
CRIME VICTIMS
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
SEXUAL ASSAULT