TX SB194 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of the criminal offense of indecent assault, to judicial protection for victims of that offense, and to certain criminal acts committed in relation to that offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of the criminal offense of indecent assault, to judicial protection for victims of that offense, and to certain criminal acts committed in relation to that offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1615 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 See remarks for effective date
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-24SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-24HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-24SenateRecord vote
2019-05-24SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2019-05-24SenateRead
2019-05-24SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-22SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1615
2019-05-22HousePassed
2019-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-21HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-21HouseLaid out as postponed business
2019-05-20HousePostponed 5/21/19 10:00 AM
2019-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-23HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-23HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-23HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2019-04-01HouseRead first time
2019-03-27HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-03-27SenateReported engrossed
2019-03-27SenateRecord vote
2019-03-27SenatePassed
2019-03-27SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-27SenateRecord vote
2019-03-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-03-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-03-27SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-03-27SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-03-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-03-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-03-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-19SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2019-02-01SenateRead first time
2018-11-15SenateFiled
2018-11-15SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB309 (Similar To) 2019-04-15 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback