TX HB2952 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the powers and duties of the Sabine-Neches Navigation District of Jefferson County; providing clarification of existing authority with regard to the imposition of maintenance taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the powers and duties of the Sabine-Neches Navigation District of Jefferson County; providing clarification of existing authority with regard to the imposition of maintenance taxes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseLaid on the table subject to call
2017-05-19HouseCompanion considered in lieu of
2017-05-19HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-12HouseReturned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
2017-05-12HouseWithdrawn from calendar
2017-05-12HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-11HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-26HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-19HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-19HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-19HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2017-04-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-12HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-12HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-11HouseRecommendations filed with the Speaker
2017-04-05HouseReferred to Natural Resources
2017-04-05HouseCorrection in referral
2017-04-04HouseReferred to Texas Ports, Innovation & Infrastructure, Select
2017-04-04HouseCorrection in referral
2017-04-05HouseWithdrawn from schedule
2017-04-05HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-22HouseReferred to Natural Resources
2017-03-22HouseRead first time
2017-03-06HouseTransmitted to the Governor
2017-03-06HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback