TX HB2938 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Introduced on March 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the conduct of investigations, prepayment reviews, and payment holds in cases of suspected fraud, waste, or abuse in the provision of health and human services.
Title
Relating to the conduct of investigations, prepayment reviews, and payment holds in cases of suspected fraud, waste, or abuse in the provision of health and human services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-15 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-14 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-07 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-07 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Public Health | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-09 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1542 (Same As) 2009-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar