TX HB2899 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-02 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-02 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to civil liability and responsibility for defects in the plans, specifications, or other documents for the construction or repair of roads, highways, and related improvements.
Title
Relating to civil liability and responsibility for defects in the plans, specifications, or other documents for the construction or repair of roads, highways, and related improvements.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Leach [R] | Rep. John Cyrier [R] | Rep. Joe Deshotel [D] | Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D] |
Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Amended RV#788 (Y: 115 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - Amended RV#773 (Y: 103 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Amended RV#788 (Y: 115 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - Amended RV#773 (Y: 103 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-02 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-02 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-16 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-30 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-30 | House | Record vote RV#788 |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed as amended |
2019-04-30 | House | Amended 1-Leach |
2019-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-29 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-29 | House | Record vote RV#773 |
2019-04-29 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-29 | House | Amended 1-Leach |
2019-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1866 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Transportation