TX HB268 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to venue in the prosecution of certain criminal conduct involving obstruction or retaliation.
Title
Relating to venue in the prosecution of certain criminal conduct involving obstruction or retaliation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#101 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#101 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-01 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-22 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-20 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-03-23 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-03-23 | House | Record vote |
2017-03-23 | House | Passed |
2017-03-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-22 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-03-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-03-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-03-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-03-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-03-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-07 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-03-07 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-03-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2017-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2016-11-14 | House | Filed |