TX HB2671 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to penalties for certain criminal offenses regarding operating a motor vehicle; imposing a fee and changing a surcharge.
Title
Relating to penalties for certain criminal offenses regarding operating a motor vehicle; imposing a fee and changing a surcharge.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-30 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2015-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Vehicles & Traffic--Insurance/Financial Responsibility
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Vehicles & Traffic--Insurance/Financial Responsibility