TX HB2545 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to franchise tax, oil production tax, and gas production tax incentives for certain desalination facility operations.
Title
Relating to franchise tax, oil production tax, and gas production tax incentives for certain desalination facility operations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#974 (Y: 116 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#974 |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed |
2019-05-03 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 1-Rosenthal |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-30 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
DESALINATION
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Taxation
Taxation--Energy Resources
Taxation--Franchise
WATER
Water--Development
Water--General
Water--Rights
DESALINATION
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Taxation
Taxation--Energy Resources
Taxation--Franchise
WATER
Water--Development
Water--General
Water--Rights