TX HB2534 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an appraisal procedure for disputed losses under personal automobile insurance policies.
Title
Relating to an appraisal procedure for disputed losses under personal automobile insurance policies.
Sponsors
Rep. Travis Clardy [R] | Rep. Eugene Wu [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1107 (Y: 91 N: 50 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-14 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1107 |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-13 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-27 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-19 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2021-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1706 (Same As) 2021-03-26 - Referred to Business & Commerce