TX HB2505 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to creating the criminal offense of boating while intoxicated with a child passenger; changing the eligibility for deferred adjudication community supervision.
Title
Relating to creating the criminal offense of boating while intoxicated with a child passenger; changing the eligibility for deferred adjudication community supervision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#682 (Y: 130 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-04 | House | Record vote RV#682 |
2021-05-04 | House | Passed |
2021-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-03 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2021-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-01 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BOATS & BOATING
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
DEFERRED ADJUDICATION
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
DEFERRED ADJUDICATION
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID