TX HB2380 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to employment by school districts of certain persons under probationary contracts.
Title
Relating to employment by school districts of certain persons under probationary contracts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-29 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-29 | Record vote | |
2011-05-29 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-29 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-29 | Record vote | |
2011-05-29 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-28 | Conference committee report filed | |
2011-05-28 | Conf. Comm. Report distributed | |
2011-05-26 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-26 | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2011-05-26 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2011-05-26 | Senate grants request for conference comm. | |
2011-05-26 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-26 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2011-05-26 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2011-05-26 | House appoints conferees | |
2011-05-26 | House requests conference committee | |
2011-05-26 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2011-05-24 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-24 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-23 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Passed | |
2011-05-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Amended | |
2011-05-23 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-23 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-20 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-20 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-19 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-16 | Referred to Education | |
2011-05-16 | Read first time | |
2011-05-16 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-15 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-13 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-13 | Record vote | |
2011-05-13 | Passed | |
2011-05-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-12 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-05-12 | Amended | |
2011-05-12 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2011-05-11 | Postponed | |
2011-05-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-11 | Vote reconsidered | |
2011-05-11 | Withdrawn from calendar | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-09 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-05 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | |
2011-05-05 | Withdrawn from calendar | |
2011-05-05 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-04 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-04-19 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-18 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-18 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-12 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-12 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-12 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Public Education | |
2011-03-10 | Read first time | |
2011-03-07 | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts