TX HB2366 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of an open-enrollment charter school operated by a municipality to give a preference in admissions to children of employees of the municipality.
Title
Relating to the authority of an open-enrollment charter school operated by a municipality to give a preference in admissions to children of employees of the municipality.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-23 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-23 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-23 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-20 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-20 | Record vote | |
2011-05-20 | Passed | |
2011-05-20 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-20 | Record vote | |
2011-05-20 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-20 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-20 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-20 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-20 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-19 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-17 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-09 | Referred to Education | |
2011-05-09 | Read first time | |
2011-05-05 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-05 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-04 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-04 | Record vote | |
2011-05-04 | Passed | |
2011-05-04 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-03 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-03 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-02 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-04-28 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-19 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-03-28 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-03-28 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-28 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-24 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-03-24 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Public Education | |
2011-03-10 | Read first time | |
2011-03-07 | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
City Government--General
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
City Government--Employees/Officers
City Government--General
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools